# Hello, and Welcome to Maths Help

Maths Help is designed to provide simple and effective help with maths by providing simple to understand examples - there are almost no textual explanations.

Either use the ready made examples, or create your own by entering your digits into the tools and calculators and then study the results.

They are laid out will full workings to help you follow, and understand the concept. In addition, you can mouse over parts of the workings to see what parts of the sums they are related to.

Where available "Helper Mode" will set out the sum for you and show you how to break down the longer sum, just enter your own working out.

You can select the different areas from the menu above.

## Times Table helper

You can highlight an answer by setting the sum from these numbers.
x =
X 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12
1123456789101112
224681012141618202224
3369121518212427303336
44812162024283236404448
551015202530354045505560
661218243036424854606672
771421283542495663707784
881624324048566472808896
9918273645546372819099108
10102030405060708090100110120
11112233445566778899110121132
121224364860728496108120132144

## Long Multiplication Calculator

Enter two numbers to multiply
(Or click an example from the sides)

• 9 x 9
• 9 x 14
• 7 x 61
• 135,015 x 73,795
• 158 x 184
• 305 x 360
• 3,622 x 1,596
• 518 x 246
• 404 x 437
• 1,673 x 9,572

• 1 x 8
• 30 x 9
• 56 x 76
• 137,550 x 118,874
• 130 x 133
• 23 x 153
• 38 x 194
• 82 x 495
• 682,758 x 37,946
• 745 x 84

## Long Division Calculator

Enter two numbers to divide
(Or click an example from the sides)

• 10 ÷ 2
• 32 ÷ 4
• 25 ÷ 3
• 156 ÷ 5
• 185 ÷ 17
• 102 ÷ 28
• 104 ÷ 36
• 5,558 ÷ 452
• 318 ÷ 41
• 860 ÷ 39
• 5,491 ÷ 14
• 265 ÷ 18
• 65 ÷ 3
• 108 ÷ 10
• 1,744 ÷ 187
• 228,956 ÷ 151
• 273 ÷ 33
• 454 ÷ 11
• 227 ÷ 45
• 181 ÷ 83